Tirmizi, Lubna Tauqir (CPSO#: 75195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1101 Kingston Road
Unit 220
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 831-9797 Ext. 2
Fax: (905) 839-9984
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Feb 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUBNA TAUQIR TIRMIZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIRMIZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2004