Tischenko, Alexander (CPSO#: 82339)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Odessa Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 May 2005 to 01 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2009