Tischler, Eugenia Marcela (CPSO#: 26859)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Bucharest, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016