Tisdale, Britton Edgett (CPSO#: 79847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4233 Maple Road
Buffalo NY  14226
United States
Phone: (716) 725-6277
Fax: (716) 725-6540
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.E. Tisdale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2009


Corporation Name: B.E. Tisdale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRITTON EDGETT TISDALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TISDALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010