Tisma-Dupanovic, Svjetlana (CPSO#: 83529)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sarajevo, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006