Tisseverasinghe, Annaliese (CPSO#: 88199)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 8054 Yonge Street Thornhill, ON L4J 1W3
Date Received: 07 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2008 to 04 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 03 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2015