Tisseverasinghe, Steven Anthony (CPSO#: 98444)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 09 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Aug 2017