Tissot Van Patot, Brian D. (CPSO#: 56886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P3E 1R4
Canada
Phone: (705) 869-1420
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Chapleau General Hospital
Box 757
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 864-1520
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Tissot Van Patot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Tissot Van Patot ( CPSO# 56886 )

Business Address:
Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1420

Business Address:
Chapleau General Hospital
Box 757
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau ON  P0M 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 864-3050

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chapleau Health Services,Chapleau General Hospital Chapleau
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN D. TISSOT VAN PATOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TISSOT VAN PATOT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1987