Tjong, Joshua Kuo-Koewang (CPSO#: 67750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Indonesian, Mandarin

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: 705-759-3434 Ext. 6889
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joshua Tjong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tjong ( CPSO# 67750 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA KUO-KOEWANG TJONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999