Tkachuk, Douglas Cameron (CPSO#: 51953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Glenallan Road
Toronto ON  M4N 1G7
Phone: (416) 912-5033
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Tkachuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tkachuk ( CPSO# 51953 )

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (416) 912-5033

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS CAMERON TKACHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TKACHUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Jan 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2002