Tlusty, Eva (CPSO#: 28829)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 06 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Faculty Paediatrics, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Gam X Ray DG Imaging 18 Kensington Rd Unit 206 Brampton, ON L6T 4S5
Date Received: 06 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2017