To, Fergus Zhi Hao (CPSO#: 105792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  21 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Elective as of 09 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
190 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 978-0745
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FERGUS ZHI HAO TO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TO is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. TO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. TO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. TO is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. TO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 21 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 09 Nov 2017 to 21 Dec 2017
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2017