To, Toan Bao (CPSO#: 57605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 218
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 743-3636
Fax: (416) 743-5961
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Toronto Western Division
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-2581
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Cardiac Care Centre
104-200 Ronson Dr
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 May 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 May 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  May  22,  2012,  the  following  is  imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held  by  Dr.  Toan  Bao  To,  in
            accordance  with  an  undertaking and consent given by Dr. To to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Toan Bao To shall  limit  his  practice  in Ontario to the University
                  Health Network, Toronto Western Hospital, the William Osler Health Centre
                  (Brampton Civic Hospital and Etobicoke General  sites),  the Cardiac Care
                  Centre located at 200 Ronson Drive, Suite 104, Toronto, Ontario  and  his
                  private  office  practice  located at 89 Humber College Blvd., Suite 218,
                  Etobicoke, Ontario. In addition, Dr. To shall notify the College prior to
                  moving jurisdictions or seeking  to practice in any other jurisdiction or
                  facility.