Toal, Meghana (CPSO#: 102204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Nagpur University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint John Regional Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
400 University Avenue
Saint John NB  E2L 4L2
Phone: (506) 648-7114

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGHANA TOAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 17 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2016