Toal, Satish Chandrakant (CPSO#: 81498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Nagpur University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint John Regional Hospital
NB Heart Centre
PO Box 2100
400 University Avenue
Saint John NB  E2L 4L2
Phone: (506) 649-2713

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
New Brunswick

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SATISH CHANDRAKANT TOAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2016