Tobe, Sheldon William (CPSO#: 55894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1929 Bayview Avenue
Room 380
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 480-5895
Fax: (416) 480-6940
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tobe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tobe ( CPSO# 55894 )

Business Address:
380 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M3G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 480-5895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELDON WILLIAM TOBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOBE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1986