Tobin, Cathryn Ellen (CPSO#: 56983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
5293 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7M7
Phone: (905) 201-9633
Fax: (905) 201-9382
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Henry Solow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tobin ( CPSO# 56983 )
Dr. H. Solow ( CPSO# 54171 )

Business Address:
Suite 407
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7072

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHRYN ELLEN TOBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOBIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1987