Tobin, Helen Joy (CPSO#: 63386)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: Mills, Helen Joy (used until: 29 Feb 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996