Tobin, Thomas Edward (CPSO#: 59403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 766-0469
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS EDWARD TOBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOBIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989