Toda, Hiroki (CPSO#: 80217)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kyoto Daigaku Igakubu, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 23 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2004