Todd, David Charles (CPSO#: 75965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 Rockhaven Lane
Suite 106
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H6
Phone: (905) 390-3033
Fax: (905) 390-2999
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lad-Todd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lad ( CPSO# 77400 )
Dr. D. Todd ( CPSO# 75965 )

Business Address:
106 - 170 Rockhaven Lane
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H6
Phone Number: (905) 390-3033

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Apr 2001 to 06 May 2001
Elective Trainee - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2004