Todd, Jonathan Keith (CPSO#: 84583)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2015