Todd, Justin Andrew (CPSO#: 93285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2120 Regent Street South Unit 2
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: 705 522 9101
Fax: 705 522 5744
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. A. Todd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Todd ( CPSO# 93285 )

Business Address:
2120 Regent Street South
Unit 2
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 522-9101

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN ANDREW TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015