Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Todd, Stanley David Lawrence (CPSO#: 69432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Services
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Todd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Todd ( CPSO# 69432 )

Business Address:
Department of Laboratory Services
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY DAVID LAWRENCE TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2002