Todd, Thomas Richard James (CPSO#: 23100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective
Association
P O Box 8225
Station T
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone: (613) 725-9965 Ext. 623
Fax: (877) 763-1300
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS RICHARD JAMES TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Sep 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1976