Toderian, Amy Beverley (CPSO#: 105896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHEARN Centre
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Family Medicine
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2326
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY BEVERLEY TODERIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODERIAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2017 to 20 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017