Toews, Adam Peter (CPSO#: 88466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
7G-116, Glendale Wing
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6486 Ext. 3221
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zhou & Toews Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toews ( CPSO# 88466 )
Dr. Y. Zhou ( CPSO# 90759 )

Business Address:
1116 - 250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Room 7G-116, Glendale Wing
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6486

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM PETER TOEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOEWS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2013