Toffoli Zadra, Nadia Diana (CPSO#: 68195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: Toffoli, Nadia Diana (used until: 18 Aug 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 832-2201
Fax: (905) 832-2246
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Toffoli-Zadra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Toffoli Zadra ( CPSO# 68195 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 832-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA DIANA TOFFOLI ZADRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOFFOLI ZADRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996