Toft, Ian Peter (CPSO#: 70138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Skin Disorders Clinic
355 Wellington St
Suite 233
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone: (519) 432-1919 Ext. 222
Fax: (519) 432-9529
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Owens and Toft Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Toft ( CPSO# 70138 )
Dr. J. Owens ( CPSO# 75060 )

Business Address:
London Skin Disorders Clinic
Suite 223
355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Business Address:
50 King Street
London ON  N6A 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 663-5317

Business Address:
University of Western Ontario
Student Health Services
Room 11 UCC
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN PETER TOFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOFT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1999