Tognotti, Darin Matthew (CPSO#: 69150)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002