Toguri, Allan Goro (CPSO#: 22871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 411
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-8913
Fax: (416) 439-0784
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2330 KENNEDY RD,SUITE 402
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-7667
Fax: (416) 756-7841
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allan Toguri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Toguri ( CPSO# 103708)
Dr. A. Toguri ( CPSO# 22871 )

Business Address:
402 - 4235 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 669-7667

Business Address:
Suite 411
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-8913

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 11 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN GORO TOGURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOGURI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970