Tokar, Judith Lynne (CPSO#: 51956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Names: Laidley, Judith Lynne (used until: 29 Jun 1987 )     Tokar, Judith Lynne (used until: 13 Aug 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
280 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 2P9
Phone: (905) 687-3615
Fax: (905) 687-6550
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH LYNNE TOKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOKAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1984