Tokarewicz, Alexander Christopher (CPSO#: 24646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. C. Tokarewicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tokarewicz ( CPSO# 24646 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CHRISTOPHER TOKAREWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOKAREWICZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1972