Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Toledo, Luiz Sergio (CPSO#: 66161)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jan 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 1995