Tolhurst, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 79189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Tolhurst Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tolhurst ( CPSO# 79189 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE TOLHURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOLHURST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006