Tolia, Atulkumar Amritlal (CPSO#: 42446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Baroda University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1000 Fleet Street
Mississauga ON  L5H 4C6
Phone: (905) 278-1743 Ext. 1503
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATULKUMAR AMRITLAL TOLIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOLIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1991