Toloza, Sergio Miguel Angel (CPSO#: 75832)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Cordoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2005 to 12 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008