Tolton, Rani Gurinderjitpal (CPSO#: 70796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1997


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Charles St.
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 341-8954
Fax: (613) 341-8954
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
St Vincent de Paul Hospital,Providence Continuing Care Centre Brockville


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RANI GURINDERJITPAL TOLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOLTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 1996 to 25 Sep 1996
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 01 Apr 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1997