Toma, Jonathan Emanuel (CPSO#: 91357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room M7-502
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Toma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Toma ( CPSO# 91357 )

Business Address:
Room M7-502
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN EMANUEL TOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015