Toma, Radu (CPSO#: 31077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
Pain Management Clinic
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-2750
Fax: 905-721-2658
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711 Ext. 3312
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health Corporation
Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3312/2800
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RADU TOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1985