Tomalty, Robert Dana (CPSO#: 55568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Radiology of Huntsville, PC
Suite 200
2006 Franklin Street
Hunstville AL  35801
United States
Phone: (256) 539-0457
Fax: (256) 539-5827

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Alabama
USA - California
USA - Tennessee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DANA TOMALTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMALTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1996