Tomarken, James Lynn (CPSO#: 28226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3500 Sunrise Highway #124
Great River NY  11739
United States
Phone: (631) 854-0100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Connecticut
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES LYNN TOMARKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMARKEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1976