Tomi, Zohair Sulaiman (CPSO#: 71837)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 111
1 Paton Street
St John's NL  A1B 4S8
Phone: (709) 770-7777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002