Tomiak, Anna Theresa (CPSO#: 58586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Center of Southeastern Ontar
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2630
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA THERESA TOMIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMIAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1989