Tomiak, Eva Maria (CPSO#: 54023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Genetics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3512
Fax: (613) 738-4822
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 06 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA MARIA TOMIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMIAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 05 Jan 2004 to 04 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 05 Jan 2005 to 04 Jan 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 05 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985