Tomkinson, Christine Barbara (CPSO#: 101426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Limerick, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Neurology
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE BARBARA TOMKINSON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TOMKINSON is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. TOMKINSON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TOMKINSON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. TOMKINSON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TOMKINSON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TOMKINSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 22 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 19 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018