Tomlin, Jennifer Leigh (CPSO#: 79456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: Procyk, Jennifer Leigh Tomlin (used until: 28 Oct 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Tomlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tomlin ( CPSO# 79456 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Mar 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEIGH TOMLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006