Tomlinson, Robert Christopher Kennedy (CPSO#: 72977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Sep 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Neonatal Intensive Care Unit
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7745
Fax: (416) 813-5245
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 22 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Jun 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Robert Christopher Kennedy Tomlinson may practise medicine independently in
            Neonatology.