Tommasini, Robert (CPSO#: 58668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yonge Eglinton Medical Centre
2401 Yonge Street
Suite 207
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 483-8382
Fax: (416) 483-6690
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT TOMMASINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMMASINI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.



See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


**As of December 15, 2016, Dr. Tommasini has fulfilled all aspects of the SCERP.**
Download Full Document (PDF)