Tompalski, Sherry Lynn (CPSO#: 57226)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 458 MacLaren Street Ottawa ON K1R 5K6
Date Received: 23 May 2017


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Box 344 Station Main Carleton Place, Ontario K7C 3P4
Date Received: 11 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017